## NCERT Solutions for Class 6 Maths Chapter 2: Whole Numbers Exercise 2.3

NCERT Solutions for Class 6 Maths Chapter 2 exercise 2.3. In exercise 2.3 we study numbers, number lines, addition, multiplication, and subtraction using suitable properties like distributive, commutative, etc. NCERT solution for class 6 maths chapter 2 helps to make your calculation fast.

### NCERT solution for class 6 maths chapter 2: whole numbers exercise 2.3

**Q.1. Which of the following will not represent zero?****(a) 1 + 0****(b) 0 × 0****(c) 0 / 2****(d) (10 – 10) / 2**

Ans:-

(a) 1 + 0 = 1 ≠ 0, does not represent zero.

(b) 0 x 0 = 0, represents zero

(c) 0/2 = 0, represents zero.

(d) 10−10/2 = 0/2 = 0 represents zero.

**Q.2. If the product of two whole numbers is zero, can we say that one or both of them will be zero? Justify through examples.**

Ans:-

Yes,

Examples:-

7 x 0 = 0

0 x 2 = 0

0 x 8 = 0

**3. If the product of two whole numbers is 1, can we say that one or both of them will be 1? Justify through examples.**

Ans:-

This is only true when each of the number is 1.

Examples:-

1 x 1 = 1

**Q.4. Find using distributive property:****(a) 728 × 101**

Ans:-

728 x 101 = 728 x (100 + 1)

= 728 x 100 + 728 x 1

= 72800 + 728

= 73528**(b) 5437 × 1001**

Ans:-

5437 x 1001 = 5437 x (1000 + 1)

= 5437 x 1000 + 5437 x 1

= 5437000 + 5437

= 5442437**(c) 824 × 25**

Ans:-

824 x 25 = 824 x (20 + 5)

= 824 x 20 + 824 x 5

= 16480 + 4120

= 20600**(d) 4275 × 125**

Ans:-

4275 x 125 = 4275 x (100 + 20 + 5)

= 4275 x 100 + 4275 x 20 + 4275 x 5

= 427500 + 85500 + 21375

= 534375**(e) 504 × 35**

Ans:-

504 x 35 = (500 + 4) x 35

= 500 x 35 + 4 x 35

= 17500 + 140

= 17640

**Q.5 Study the pattern:1 x 8 + 1= 912 x 8 + 2 = 98123 x 8 + 3 = 9871234 x 8 + 4 = 987612345 x 8 + 5 = 98765Write the next two steps. Can you say how the pattern works?**

**(Hint: 12345 = 11111 + 1111 + 111 + 11 + 1)**

Ans:-

Step I: 123456 x 8 + 6 = 987654

Step II: 1234567 x 8 + 7 = 9876543

Working pattern:

(1) x 8 + 1 = 9

(12) x 8 + 2 = (11 + 1) x 8 + 2 = 98

(123) x 8 + 3 = (111 + 11 + 1) x 8 + 3 = 987

(1234) x 8 + 4 = (1111 + 111 + 11 + 1) x 8 + 4 = 9876

(12345) x 8 + 5 = (11111 + 1111 + 111 + 11 + 1) x 8 + 5 = 98765